
Q) Find the sum of the 432765 and 346056?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Find the difference of 98432 and 34567?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Fin dthe product of 39616 and 7?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Divide the following 81606 by 8?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) In which property of addition when the order of the addends is changed, the sum remains the same?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Addition is finding the total or sum combining?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Finding the difference of two or more numbers is known as?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Multiplication can be defined as the?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Splitting into equal parts or groups is known as?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) 436096  285766 =?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Find the product of the number 7777 * 19 = ?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) The four basic mathematical operations are?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Write the Properties of Addition?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Write the properties of Subtraction?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Write the properties of Multiplication?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Write the properties of Division?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Explain about the Estimating Operations On Numbers?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is Division?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is Multiplication?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is Subtraction?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is Addition?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Add 34, 72, 514 and 26, 91, 015?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) 12 + 9  14 * 6 / 3 = ?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Multiply 52917 by 4?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) A factory produces 13,567 cars every month. How many cars are produced in 6 months?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) 20 families went on a trip which cost them Rs 5, 34, 123. How much did each family pay?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is the difference between the greatest 7digit number and the smallest 8digit number?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) A carton can hold 16, 890 beads. If 9 such cartons are to be sent, what is the actual and approximate number of beads sent?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) 1, 50, 345 bricks were used for Mr Sharms's house, and 2, 12, 345 bricks were used for Mr Verma's house. Whose house required more bricks and by how many?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Explain about the Estimating Operations On Numbers and give an example?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is Addition an addition? Give an examples?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) What is multiplication and division an addition? Give an examples?
A) Show/hide Answer
Q) Multiply 327 by 586?
A) Show/hide Answer
There are four basic fundamental operations namely, addition, subtraction, multiplication and division.
Let us learn about these operations in detail.
The four basic mathematical operations are + ,  , × , ÷.
"Addition is finding the total or sum combining two or more numbers"
Example:
Addition Of Larger Numbers
In order to find the sum of numbers, we have to add them.
Each number to be added in an addition is called an addend.
In an addition operation, we have two, three, four, or many addends.
The answer to an addition operation is called a sum
In order to find the sum of large numbers, the steps below are to be followed
 Arrange the addends in the column form.
 Start adding from the ones column, then move to the tens, and so on.
 Regroup if required
Examples:
 Add 34, 72, 514 and 26, 91, 015.
Solution:
The process of above addition is the same as we add with the 6digit numbers
We can add more than two addends and can also change the order of the addends. The sum will always be the same
 Add 62, 21, 238 ; 14, 653 and 3, 42, 36, 207 in two ways.
Solution:
Order is not changed Order is changed
a)Order Property
When the order of the addends is changed, the sum remains the same.
1, 52, 286 + 34, 247 = 1, 86, 533 and
34, 247 + 1, 52, 286 = 1, 86, 533.
b)Zero Property
The sum of zero and the number is the number itself.
2, 34, 706 + 0 = 2, 34, 706
0 + 2, 34, 706 = 2, 34, 706
c)Grouping Property
The sum remains the same, even if the grouping of addends is changed.
(25000 + 4000) + 3000 = 32, 000
25000 + (4000 + 3000) = 32, 000
(25000 + 3000) + 4000 = 32, 000
"Finding the difference of two or more numbers is known as subtraction"
Example:
Subtraction Of Larger Numbers
In order to find the difference of two or more numbers, we have to subtract them.
The first number in subtraction is known as the minuend.
In the above example,(9  4 = 5), 9 is the minuend.
The number to be subtracted from the minuend is known as the subtrahend
In the above example, 4 is the subtrahend.
To subtract large numbers, we follow the steps given below:
 Arrange the minuend and the subtrahend in column form.
 Start subtraction from the ones column, regroup the digits if needed, then move to the tens column, and so on.
Arrange the numbers in columns by writing the greater number above the smaller number.
Example:
Subtract 8, 95, 56, 734 from 5, 72, 32, 610.
Solution:
So, the answer is 3, 23, 24, 124.Checking Subtraction
Addition is involved to check the accuracy of subtraction in such a way that:
 Add the difference obtained and the subtrahend.
 If the sum is equal to the minuend, the subtraction is correct.
 Else there is a mistake in the calculation.
Example:
Subtract 3, 17, 25, 124 from 7, 24, 38, 297 and check the subtraction.
Solution:
First we will subtract both the numbers, and then add the difference to the subtrahend.
 The order of the numbers involved in subtraction cannot be changed.
 When a number is subtracted from itself, the difference is zero.
 When the minuend and the subtrahend are the same, the difference is zero.
 34, 46, 72134, 46, 721 = 0.
 When zero is subtracted from the number, the difference is the number itself.
 12, 98, 4560 = 12, 98, 456.
Example:
Example:
"Multiplication can be defined as the process of repeated addition of a number".
Example:
Multiplying Larger Numbers
 Start multiplying from the ones column.
 Move to the tens column, add the carried over number if any, and so on.
In order to multiply larger numbers, we follow the steps below:
Example:
Solution:
Multiplication Using The Expanded Form
Example:
Multiply 52917 by 4.
Solution:
This can be done by two methods
The table below shows multiplying of a number, by a 2 digit, 3  digit and 4  digit multiplier.
 The product does not change even if the order is changed.
 234 × 192 = 44928 and 192 × 234 = 44928.
 The product of any number and 1 is the number itself.
 365791 × 1 = 365791 and 1 × 365791 = 365791.
 The product of a number and zero is zero.
 9723564 × 0 = 0 and 0 × 9723564 = 0.
 Even if the grouping is changed, the product remains the same.
 (43215 × 4) × 2 = 43215 × (4 × 2) = (43215 × 2) × 4 = 345720
Example:
Example:
Example:
We know that,
 A number when multiplied by 1 gives the number itself.
 When a number is multiplied by 10, we put a zero to the right of the multiplicand to get the product.
 In this way, when we multiply a number generally by 10, 100, 1000 etc., we put as many zeros to the right of the multiplicand as there are zeros in the multiplier.
 This kind of multiplication where the number ends with zero can be done mentally with a little logic involved.
Example:
Example:
Example:
Example:
Solution:
 Multiply the nonzero digits, 5 × 4 = 20.
 Put as many zeros as there are in both the multiplicand and multiplier
zero 1 zero 2 zeros
2) Multiply 20 × 60 × 30.
Solution:
 Multiply the nonzero digits, 2 × 6 × 3 = 36.
 Put as many zeros are there in all the three numbers.
 So, the answer we get is 36000.
3) Multiply 312 by 400 horizontally
Solution:
 Multiply the nonzero digits, i.e., 312 × 4 = 1248.
 Put as many zeros as there are in the numbers.
 Hence, 312 × 400 = 124800
Definition
Lattice multiplication is a method of multiplying two numbers in a grid.
The whole procedure is equivalent to regular long multiplication, but the advantage is that the lattice method breaks the process of multiplication into smaller steps.
Let us learn the lattice multiplication of a 3  digit multiplicand and a 3digit multiplier.
Example:
Multiply 327 by 586.
Solution:
Since the multiplicand and the multiplier are 3 digit numbers, we draw a 3 × 3 square grid and divide each of the nine subsquares with an oblique line.
Steps to follow for lattice multiplication:
 Write the digits of the multiplicand along the top horizontal side of the subsquares.
 Write the digits of the multiplier along the right vertical side of the subsquares.
 Multiply each digit of the multiplicand with one digit of the multiplier at a time.
 Write the product by adding the sum (from the extreme right) of the numbers in each parallel.
 So, the product of 327 × 586 = 191622
"Splitting into equal parts or groups is known as division"
Example:
Division Of Larger Numbers
Let us see the division of numbers by 1 digit, 2 digit and 3  digit divisors.In all the three cases, the verifications are done by the following method:
Dividend = Divisor × Quotient + Remainder
 965 = 5 × 193 + 0. 965 = 965.
 5876 = 26 × 226 + 0 5876 = 5876.
 27135 = 603 × 45 + 0 27135 = 27135.
Hence, verified.
Hence verified.
Hence, verified
Example:
There are 4560 books in 10 boxes. How many books are there in each box?
Solution:
456 ÷ 1 = 456
So, 4560 ÷ 10 = 456
The zero in the divisor divides the zero in the dividend.
Example:
Divide 25470 by 100.Solution:
25470 ÷ 100.There are two zeros in the divisor. The digits in the dividend at the tens and ones place become the remainder and the rest of the digits will form the quotient.
So, Quotient = 254 and Remainder = 70.
Example:
Divide 832567 by 1000.Solution:
832567 ÷ 1000.There are 3 zeros in the divisor. The digits in the dividend at the hundreds, tens and ones place will form the remainder and the rest of the digits will form the quotient.
Quotient = 832 and Remainder = 567.
 If we divide a number by 1, the quotient is the number itself.
367 ÷ 1 = 367.  If we divide a number by itself, the quotient is 1.
367 ÷ 367 = 1.  If we divide 0 by a number, the quotient is 0.
 Dividing a number by 0 does not make any sense
Problem Solving Skills
Before solving a problem, following points should be remembered
 Read the question carefully
 Understand the question thoroughly
 Find the facts given in the question
 Make a mental picture of the question
 Solve the question step by step
 Check the answer.
Estimation gives us an approximation of required information which is close to the result
Let us see the estimation of sum, difference, product and quotient of various Numbers.