Multiplication

 Mind Maps

Class III - maths: Multiplication
One Word Answer Questions:
Q) Find the product for 9 * 4 = ___?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Fill in the missign number 7 * ___ = 42?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Fill in the blanks and find the product for 9 * __ = 5 * 9 = ___?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Multiply 54 * 5=___?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Find the product for 78 * 5?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Find the missing factor for ___ * 5 = 45
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) Multiply 92 * 5=___ ?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) The total number of legs 6 deer have = 6 x 4 = ?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) The product of 7 and 9 is ?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) The number we get after multiplying two numbers is called?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Q) 444 x 10 = ?
A)    Show/hide Answer

Short Answer Questions:
Q) Explain about factor?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Multiply by hundreds 15 * 100 = __ and 28 * 100 = __?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) What is multiplicand,multiplier and product?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Explain about product?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Mutiplying three digit number for 132 by 8?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Write in two ways for 39 tens = ___ hundreds ___ tens = ___ hundreds ___ tens?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Find the product for 516 * 9 = ___?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Multiply number with 10 for 2165 * 10 = ?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Write in two ways? 53 tens = ___ hundreds ___tens = ___ hundreds ___tens?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) A carton holds 43 Grapes. How many Grapes are there in 21 such cartons?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Long Answer Questions:
Q) A carton holds 36 apples. How many apples are there in 25 such cartons?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) There are 12 packets of pencils.each packet has 124 pencils.How many pencils are there in all?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) In a cricket stadium the north stand has 23 rows with 16 seats in each row. How many seats are there in the stand?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) A shopkeeper buys 46 crates of mangoes at rs 25 per crate. How much money does he pay?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Explain about multiplying by tens. Give example?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Explain about multiplying by 0 or 1.Give example?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Explain about multiplying by hundreds.Give example?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Write in two ways? 89 ones = __ tens __ ones = ___ tens ___ ones?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Ishanth likes a shirt that costs Rs 395.he bought 14 of them but of different colours. how much money did he spend in all?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) There are 6 Apples on each plate. if there are 145 plates, how many Apples are their in all?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) Pandi played 32 matches and scored 75 runs in each match. what was pandi's total score in all the 42 matches?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Q) A certain Mathematics book has 97 pages. How many pages are there in all 6 such Mathematics books?
A)   Show/hide Answer

Factors And Products

Multiplication is nothing but adding the same number again and again. The result is called "PRODUCT". the two numbers that are multiplied are called "Factors".

Examples:
4 + 4 + 4 = 12 same as 4 × 3 = 12 4 and 3 are factors, Product is 12

7 + 7 + 7 + 7 = 28 same as 7 × 4 = 28 7 and 4 are factors, Product is 28

3 + 3 + 3 + 3 + 3 + 3 + 3 = 21 same as 3 × 7 = 21 3 and 7 are factors, Product is 21

When we multiply 5 by 3, we get 15, Right?
In short, we write 5 × 3 = 15. Here, 5 and 3 are called the Factors and 15 is the Product.

Example
3 × 7 = 21, 3 × 7 is factors and 21 is product.

 Factors Product 3 , 7 21

Example 1:Find the product of 3 and 10.
Solution: 3 × 10 = 30. The product is 30.

Example 2: Find the missing factor:_______ × 6 = 30.
Solution: We can easily find out from the table of 6 that the missing factor is 5. It is so because 5 × 6 = 30.

Example 3:Sekhar and his friends had come to watch a Basketball game in which Sekhar's brother Mahesh was playing.Mahesh has scored 25 points in each of the last 4 games!!. How many points he scored altogether in 4 games?

Solution: Altogether, Mahesh has scored (25+25+25+25) points=100 points.
This is the same as 25 × 4, as multiplication means repeated addition.

 H T O 2 2 5 4 1 0 0

Answer:100 points

Multiplying 3 Digit Numbers

In three digit number, we know we have ones place, tens place and Hundreds place.
When multiplying:
• Multiply the ones
• Multiply the tens
• Multiply the Hundreds
• Regroup tens and hundreds
• Add them all to get the Product

Example: Multiply 243 by 3.
Solution:
Step 1: multiply the ones.     3 × 3 ones = 9 ones
Step 2: Multiply the tens.     4 × 3 tens = 12 tens.

Regrouping is needed.
12 tens = 1 hundred and 2 tens
Write 2 in the tens column and carry 1 to the hundreds column.
Step 3: Multiply the hundreds.     2 × 3 hundred = 6 hundreds
6 hundreds + 1 hundred (carried over) = 7 hundreds
Write 7 in the hundreds column.

 H T O 21 4 3 3 7 2 9

Product or Answer : 729.

Multiplying By 0 or 1

Multiplying By 0: When you multiply any number by 0, the answer (product) is always 0. In other words we are saying 0 times of some number which is zero.
Example: 9 × 0 = 0
3125 × 0 = 0
Multiplying By 1: When you multiply any number by 1, the answer is always the number itself. one times of any number is same the number itself.
Example: 7 × 1 = 7

Multiplying By Tens: Any number multiplied by 10 is the number with a zero in the ones place and the number is moved to the left.
Example: 62 × 10 = 620

#### Look at ten table; same as one table except zeros in ones place! Now we know we are experts in one and ten tables!!

 1 × 10 = 10 2 × 10 = 20 3 × 10 = 30 4 × 10 = 40 5 × 10 = 50 6 × 10 = 60 7 × 10 = 70 8 × 10 = 80 9 × 10 = 90 10 × 10 = 100

To multiply the numbers by 10, we write a zero in the ones place and multiply the other numbers.

What about multiplication by 20,30,40 and so on?
42 × 20 = 840
11 × 80 = 880
15 × 90 = 1350

Multiplying By 100's

Multiplying By Hundreds: To multiply a number by 100, we write two zeros at the end, that is in the tens and ones place and move the digits of the number to be multiplied to the left.

Example: 3 × 100 = 300
5 × 200 = 1000
12 × 300 = 3600

Multiplicand, The Multiplier, And The Product

In a multiplication sum,

1. The number to be multiplied is known as the multiplicand.
2. The number by which the multiplicand is multiplied is called the multiplier.
3. The answer we get is called the product.

Multiplying by a 2-Digit Multiplier

We have learnt multiplying with 1 digit multipliers. Now, we shall learn to multiply by 2 digit multipliers.

Example: In a cricket stadium the north stand has 23 rows with 16 seats in each row. How many seats are there in the stand?

Solution: Here, the multiplier is 16.
We can write 16 as 16 =10+6.
Therefore, multiply 23 by 10 and 6 separately, and add the two products which will give the final product.
23×6=138 and 23×10=230
Therefore, 23×16=23(6+10)=(23×6)+(23×10)=138+230=368.

Meritpath...Way to Success!

Meritpath provides well organized smart e-learning study material with balanced passive and participatory teaching methodology. Meritpath is on-line e-learning education portal with dynamic interactive hands on sessions and worksheets.